Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Vann Johnston, Jr.

Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1959 BornKnoxville, TN
9 Jun 199030.6Ordained PriestPriest of Knoxville, Tennessee, USA
24 Jan 200848.2AppointedBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
31 Mar 200848.4Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
15 Sep 201555.9AppointedBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
4 Nov 201556.0InstalledBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for James Vann Johnston, Jr.:
Bishop James Vann Johnston, Jr. (born ) Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kansas City-Saint Joseph.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,699
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2015
  • i: CB, 15 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015