Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Bürkler

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Gallen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1863BornRorschach
17 Mar 188825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
28 Oct 191350.6SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
16 Dec 191350.8ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
1 Feb 191450.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
28 May 193067.2DiedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Robert Bürkler:
Bishop Robert Bürkler (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Gallen

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013