Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Gisler

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Chur

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1863BornBürglen
28 Oct 188724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
20 Apr 192865.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
20 Apr 192865.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
1 Jul 192865.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
4 Jan 193268.7DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Anton Gisler:
Bishop Anton Gisler (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Chur

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015