Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Mark Buechlein, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1938Born
15 Aug 196325.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
3 May 196426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Jan 198748.7AppointedBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
2 Mar 198748.8Ordained BishopBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
14 Jul 199254.2AppointedArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
9 Sep 199254.3InstalledArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
21 Sep 201173.4ResignedArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
25 Jan 201879.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Mark Buechlein (VIAF: 55991721)
Archbishop Daniel Mark Buechlein O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Indianapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJasper, IN
Death PlaceInfirmary, Saint Meinrad Archabbey, St. Meinrad, Archdiocese of Indianapolis, Indiana
Buried Place (Original)Saint Meinrad Archabbey, Cemetery, St. Meinrad, Archdiocese of Indianapolis, Indiana

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2011
  • d: CB, 25 Jan 2018
  • burO: CB, 26 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 17 Jul 2018

Quantcast