Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Andrew Gettelfinger

Bishop Emeritus of Evansville, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1935 BornRamsey
7 May 196125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
11 Mar 198953.3AppointedBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
11 Apr 198953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
26 Apr 201175.5RetiredBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Andrew Gettelfinger:
Bishop Gerald Andrew Gettelfinger (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Evansville

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Evansville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 12 Jan 2015