Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Denver

Archidioecesis Denveriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Samuel Joseph Aquila, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Colorado and Utah
1868ErectedDiocese of Santa Fe Vicariate Apostolic of Colorado and Utah (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Colorado
1870Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Colorado and Utah Vicariate Apostolic of Colorado
Diocese of Denver
16 August 1887ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Colorado Diocese of Denver (erected)
15 November 1941Territory LostDiocese of Denver Diocese of Pueblo (erected)
Archdiocese of Denver
15 November 1941ElevatedDiocese of Denver Archdiocese of Denver
10 November 1983Territory LostArchdiocese of Denver
Diocese of Pueblo
Diocese of Colorado Springs (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Denver
190899,485627113374853160ce
Archdiocese of Denver
1950100,299850,00011.8%1381082464071211,00092ap1951
1966260,8481,347,57519.4%1761523287951721,117109ap1967
1970288,5981,642,40017.6%179351530544377933114ap1971
1976312,1732,109,80614.8%21520241774824249937128ap1977
1980309,8392,321,40013.3%17721038780061283931132ap1981
1990330,0002,325,00014.2%1651623271,009114231574111ap1991
1999346,1442,644,00413.1%1591262851,21413422436112ap2000
2000363,4602,719,27913.4%1651322971,223139140477106ap2001
2001373,5002,719,30013.7%1731262991,249149153427113ap2002
2002373,5002,907,80012.8%1801273071,216149154404113ap2003
2003367,9962,907,80012.7%1861223081,194143149464119ap2004
2004344,0152,996,70811.5%1901193091,113195130332120ap2005
2006398,2503,074,31513.0%1951123071,297171127316120ap2007
2010541,4103,299,91116.4%1981083061,769184131261119ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013