Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Coleman Thompson

Archbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1961 Born
30 May 198726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
26 Apr 201150.0AppointedBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
29 Jun 201150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
13 Jun 201756.1AppointedArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
28 Jul 201756.2InstalledArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Coleman Thompson
Archbishop Charles Coleman Thompson (born ) Archbishop of Indianapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouisville, Archdiocese of Louisville, Kentucky

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Indianapolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2011
  • c2+: CB, 29 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,085
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2017
  • i: CB, 13 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jun 2017