Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher James Coyne

Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1958 Born
7 Jun 198627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
14 Jan 201152.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
14 Jan 201152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mopta
2 Mar 201152.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mopta
21 Sep 201153.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
3 Dec 201254.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
22 Dec 201456.5AppointedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
29 Jan 201556.6InstalledBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA

MicroData Summary for Christopher James Coyne
Bishop Christopher James Coyne (born ) Bishop of Burlington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoburn, MA
Ordained BishopSaint John the Evangelist, Church, Indianapolis, Archdiocese of Indianapolis, Indiana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Burlington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,963
  • ab: CB, 21 Sep 2011
  • c1: CB, 12 Oct 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2014
  • i: CB, 22 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 17 Jul 2018

Quantcast