Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Ambrosio Lewis Tullock, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of David, Panama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1918Born
24 Feb 194930.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
22 Jun 196546.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá
22 Jun 196546.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Petra
3 Oct 196546.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Petra
22 May 198667.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of David, Panama
18 Apr 199475.4RetiredCoadjutor Bishop of David, Panama
29 Nov 200486.0DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of David, Panama

MicroData Summary for Carlos Ambrosio Lewis Tullock
Bishop Carlos Ambrosio Lewis Tullock S.V.D. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of David

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Boca
Ordained PriestBay St. Louis, MS

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Feb 2018