Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Napolioni

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1957 Born
25 Jun 198325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Camerino, Italy
16 Nov 201557.9AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
30 Jan 201658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Napolioni
Bishop Antonio Napolioni (born ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cremona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2015
  • ob/c123: CB, 16 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 18 Nov 2015
  • c4: CB, 22 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,805

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017