Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francesco Massara

Archbishop-Elect of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1965 Born
17 Apr 199327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea, Italy
27 Jul 201853.0AppointedArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
6 Oct 201853.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
21 Oct 201853.3InstalledArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Massara
Father Francesco Massara (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Camerino-San Severino Marche

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTropea, Diocese of Nicotera e Tropea
Ordained BishopMaria Santissima Assunta in Cielo, Cathedral Basilica, Mileto, Diocese of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Camerino-San Severino Marche.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 27 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Jul 2018

Quantcast