Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Roderick MacDonald

Deceased

Bishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1891Born
23 Jan 191624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
5 Jun 194351.9AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
24 Aug 194352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
3 Mar 194553.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
3 Mar 194553.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ancusa
13 Apr 195058.7SucceededBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
18 Dec 195968.4DiedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Roderick MacDonald
Bishop John Roderick MacDonald (born , died ) Bishop of Antigonish

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort-Hood

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast