Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camille-André Le Blanc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1898Born
5 Apr 192425.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 194243.9AppointedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
8 Sep 194244.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
8 Jan 196970.3ResignedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
8 Jan 196970.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
23 Nov 197072.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Maxita
19 Aug 199394.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick

MicroData Summary for Camille-André Le Blanc
Bishop Camille-André Le Blanc (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bathurst in Canada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarachois

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 50.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast