Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cornelius O’Brien

Deceased

Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1843BornNew Glasgow
8 Apr 187127.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 188239.6AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
21 Jan 188339.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
10 Mar 190662.8DiedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Cornelius O’Brien:
Archbishop Cornelius O’Brien (born , died ) Archbishop of Halifax

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 298
  • c2+: CB, 18 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Jun 2014