Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick James Skinner, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1904Born
30 May 192925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
24 Jan 195045.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
24 Jan 195045.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenobias
17 Mar 195046.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenobias
23 Jan 195146.8AppointedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
23 Mar 195147.0InstalledArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
28 Mar 197975.0RetiredArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
20 Sep 198884.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Patrick James Skinner
Archbishop Patrick James Skinner C.I.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint John’s, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast