Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Joseph Gilbert

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1915Born
3 Jun 194327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
3 Apr 197458.4AppointedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
19 Jun 197458.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
2 Apr 198670.4ResignedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
14 Mar 199983.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Arthur Joseph Gilbert
Bishop Arthur Joseph Gilbert (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanticton

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast