Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Emmanuel-Dieudonné Bouvier

Deceased

Bishop of Tarentaise


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1834BornNiort-la-Fontaine
19 Sep 185723.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Oct 188753.3SelectedBishop of Tarentaise, France
25 Nov 188753.4ConfirmedBishop of Tarentaise, France
25 Jan 188853.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
11 Apr 190065.8DiedBishop of Tarentaise, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Emmanuel-Dieudonné Bouvier:
Bishop Pierre-Emmanuel-Dieudonné Bouvier (born , died ) Bishop of Tarentaise

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013