Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Reger

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Aachen

Titular Bishop of Árd Sratha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1930 BornGiescheid
25 Jul 196029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Aachen, Germany
23 Dec 198656.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
23 Dec 198656.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Árd Sratha
7 Feb 198756.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Árd Sratha
15 Mar 200675.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Reger:
Bishop Karl Reger (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Aachen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aachen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013