Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Clifford Newman

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Titular Bishop of Numluli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1928Born
29 May 195425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
25 May 198455.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
25 May 198455.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Numluli
2 Jul 198455.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numluli
28 Aug 200375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
20 May 201788.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for William Clifford Newman
Bishop William Clifford Newman (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Death PlaceMercy Ridge Retirement Community, Timonium, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 20 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017