Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Bizzeti, S.J.

Vicar Apostolic of Anatolia

Titular Bishop of Tabae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1947 BornFirenze, Italy
22 Nov 196619.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
21 Jun 197527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jun 198234.7Solemn ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Aug 201567.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Anatolia, Turkey
14 Aug 201567.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabae
1 Nov 201568.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabae
29 Nov 201568.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of Anatolia, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Paolo Bizzeti
Bishop Paolo Bizzeti S.J. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Anatolia

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Anatolia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Aug 2015
  • i: CB, 1 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jun 2016