Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Piretto, O.P.

Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

Apostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek)

Apostolic Administrator of Istanbul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1942 Born
16 Dec 196321.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Aug 196623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Nov 201572.8AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
19 Dec 201573.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
8 Dec 202077.9RetiredArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
24 Dec 202078.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul, Turkey
24 Dec 202078.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey
18 Dec 202179.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Piretto
Archbishop Lorenzo Piretto O.P. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTonengo di Mazzé, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. John, Cathedral, Izmir, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 4 Dec 2015
  • c2+: CB, 20 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,693
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Sep 2021

Quantcast