Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Aimé Léon Marie, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1899Born
12 Jul 192525.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
28 Oct 192526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Jan 194545.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of French Guiana-Cayenne, Antilles
12 Jan 194545.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mundinitza
1 May 194545.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mundinitza
29 Feb 195656.4AppointedBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
1 Mar 197373.4RetiredBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
8 Nov 197475.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Alfred Aimé Léon Marie (VIAF: 32045084)
Bishop Alfred Aimé Léon Marie C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cayenne (Cajenna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVimoutiers, Diocese of Sées {Séez}, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fort-de-France, Diocese of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre)
Death PlaceVillejuif, Diocese of Créteil, France

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 21
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast