Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gérard-Paul-Louis-Marie de Milleville, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Conakry {Konakry}

Titular Archbishop of Gabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1912BornLondinières, France
26 Aug 193927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
8 May 195542.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Conakry, Guinea
8 May 195542.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dalisandus in Pamphylia
14 Sep 195543.3AppointedArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
20 Nov 195543.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
10 Mar 196249.8ResignedArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
10 Mar 196249.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabala
1964¹51.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
29 Jan 196855.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
5 Oct 197058.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
1984¹71.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
12 Jan 200794.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gérard-Paul-Louis-Marie de Milleville:
Archbishop Gérard-Paul-Louis-Marie de Milleville C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Conakry {Konakry}

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 104
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013