Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wincenty Lipski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tiraspol

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1795BornLozowica k. Klimowicz
5 Apr 182429.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 May 182429.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 185661.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
18 Sep 185661.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
9 Jan 185761.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
13 Dec 187580.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tiraspol, Moldova

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Lipski:
Bishop Wincenty Lipski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tiraspol

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,787
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Sep 2014