Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michał Nowodworski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1831Born
20 Aug 185423.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188958.4AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
1 May 189058.7Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
12 Jun 189664.8DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Michał Nowodworski (VIAF: 161658027)
Bishop Michał Nowodworski (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWłocławek, Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St Petersbourg

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 460
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017