Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Beltrami

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1889Born
5 Mar 191627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Fossano, Italy
19 Feb 194051.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
20 Feb 194051.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
20 Feb 194051.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
7 Apr 194051.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
3 Nov 194556.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
4 Oct 195061.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
31 Jan 195970.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
26 Jun 196778.4Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196778.4RetiredApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
29 Jun 196778.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
13 Dec 197384.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Beltrami (VIAF: 41381186)
Giuseppe Cardinal Beltrami (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Netherlands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFossano, Diocese of Fossano, Italy

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 20
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 100, and Page 137, and Page 163
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast