Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimundo María Julián Manguán-Martín y Delgado, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verapaz, Cobán

Titular Bishop of Turris in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1882BornCaleruega, Spain
18 Sep 189715.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Mar 190624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 May 194462.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
16 May 194462.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trocmades
3 Sep 194462.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trocmades
14 Nov 194563.8AppointedBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
Apr 1951³69.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Petén, Guatemala
11 Jul 195674.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of El Petén, Guatemala
28 May 196684.3ResignedBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
28 May 196684.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris in Proconsulari
8 Dec 197593.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimundo María Julián Manguán-Martín y Delgado:
Bishop Raimundo María Julián Manguán-Martín y Delgado O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verapaz, Cobán

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015