Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Soracco

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1890BornCanevele di Certenoli
1914²23.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 193444.6AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
19 Mar 193544.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
11 Mar 194352.9DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Soracco:
Bishop Angelo Soracco (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015