Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camilo Plácido Crous y Salichs, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sibundoy

Titular Bishop of Cratia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1896BornCalella de la Costa, Spain
20 Dec 191923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Apr 194750.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caquetá, Colombia
10 Apr 194750.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cratia
6 Jul 194751.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cratia
8 Feb 195154.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sibundoy, Colombia
16 Jan 197174.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Sibundoy, Colombia
20 Jan 198588.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sibundoy, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Camilo Plácido Crous y Salichs:
Bishop Camilo Plácido Crous y Salichs O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sibundoy

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015