Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael González Estrada

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Matrega


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1909BornSan José Rinconcido
21 Sep 193526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
16 May 194435.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
16 May 194435.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Matrega
3 Sep 194435.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Matrega
1955²45.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
29 May 198475.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
7 Mar 199485.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guatemala

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafael González Estrada:
Bishop Rafael González Estrada (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guatemala

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013