Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Basilius Tomaggian, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1762Born
9 Aug 181653.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
22 Sep 181653.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
20 May 183572.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania

MicroData Summary for Thomas Basilius Tomaggian
Archbishop Thomas Basilius Tomaggian O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePera Constantinople

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 45
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast