Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Baldini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1770³BornRoma, Italy
12 Mar 179626.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 182049.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
27 Feb 182050.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
8 May 183060.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Baldini:
Archbishop Antonio Baldini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014