Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gelasio Serao

Deceased

Bishop of Cariati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1772³BornVentaroli
20 Dec 179422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 179624.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 181946.4SelectedBishop of Cariati, Italy
4 Jun 181946.6ConfirmedBishop of Cariati, Italy
6 Jun 181946.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati, Italy
1838¹65.2DiedBishop of Cariati, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gelasio Serao:
Bishop Gelasio Serao (born ) Bishop of Cariati

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013