Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Corigliano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nard˛


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1759BornCorato
20 Dec 178324.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 181858.3SelectedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
4 Jun 181959.5ConfirmedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
6 Jun 181959.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
15 Dec 182465.0ResignedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
14 Feb 182565.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Corigliano
Bishop Leopoldo Corigliano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nard˛

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1819, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016