Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Amici

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1764Born
22 Sep 179228.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 181551.1AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
26 Mar 181551.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
8 Feb 181854.0DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Amici
Bishop Luca Amici (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrevi

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 15
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast