Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Vincenzo Airenti, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1767³BornDolcedo
3 Apr 179022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Jun 182053.0SelectedBishop of Savona, Italy
2 Oct 182053.3ConfirmedBishop of Savona, Italy
8 Oct 182053.3Ordained BishopBishop of Savona, Italy
3 Apr 183062.8SelectedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
5 Jul 183063.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
3 Sep 183164.2DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Vincenzo Airenti:
Archbishop Giuseppe Vincenzo Airenti O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1828
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 220, and Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013