Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Maria Raimondo Leopoldo Cardinal Arezzo

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1756³BornOrbetello, Italy
14 Mar 177922.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 177922.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 180245.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
4 Apr 180245.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
8 Mar 181659.2Elevated to Cardinal
29 Apr 181659.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
29 May 182063.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
5 Jul 183073.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
3 Feb 183376.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Maria Raimondo Leopoldo Arezzo (VIAF: 88896159)
Tommaso Maria Raimondo Leopoldo Cardinal Arezzo (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
  • a cardinal for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 8
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 341
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016