Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio (François-Xavier) Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1758Born
19 Sep 178425.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 181556.2AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
26 Mar 181556.3Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
2 Oct 181859.8AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
2 Feb 182465.1DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio (François-Xavier) Pereira
Bishop Francesco Saverio (François-Xavier) Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 17
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 319, and Page 362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast