Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Antonio de Fulgure, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1754BornAversa
24 May 177723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
20 Mar 181863.9SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
25 May 181864.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
31 May 181864.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
6 Jan 183378.7DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio de Fulgure:
Archbishop Giovanni Antonio de Fulgure C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Taranto

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013