Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adeodato Venturini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pontremoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1777BornPontremoli
4 Apr 180124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Aug 182144.6AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
15 Aug 182144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
1 Sep 183760.6DiedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adeodato Venturini:
Bishop Adeodato Venturini O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Pontremoli

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013