Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Fa di Bruno

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1762BornAlessandria
18 Dec 178624.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 181755.0SelectedBishop of Asti, Italy
16 Mar 181855.3ConfirmedBishop of Asti, Italy
24 Mar 181855.3Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
10 Nov 182967.0DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Fa di Bruno
Bishop Antonio Fa di Bruno (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1818, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 3 May 2016