Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Wallace Banach

Apostolic Nuncio to Sénégal

Titular Archbishop of Memphis

Apostolic Nuncio to Cape Verde

Apostolic Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau

Apostolic Delegate to Mauritania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1962 BornWorcester
2 Jul 198825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
22 Feb 201350.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio
22 Feb 201350.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Memphis
16 Apr 201350.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
27 Apr 201350.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Memphis
18 May 201350.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands
19 Mar 201653.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sénégal
19 Mar 201653.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mauritania
9 Jul 201653.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cape Verde
22 Aug 201653.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau

MicroData Summary for Michael Wallace Banach
Archbishop Michael Wallace Banach (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Sénégal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Sénégal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2013
  • ob: CB, 16 Apr 2013
  • c2+: CB, 27 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,775
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Aug 2016