Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel José Macín

Bishop of Reconquista


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1967 BornMalabrigo
9 Jul 199225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Reconquista, Argentina
12 Oct 201346.5AppointedBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
24 Nov 201346.6Ordained BishopBishop of Reconquista, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ángel José Macín:
Bishop Ángel José Macín (born ) Bishop of Reconquista

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Reconquista.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 151
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,983

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 24 Aug 2015