Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Jofré Giraudo

Bishop of Villa María, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1957 Born
8 Dec 198326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
28 Feb 201355.7AppointedBishop of Villa María, Argentina
5 May 201355.9Ordained BishopBishop of Villa María, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Samuel Jofré Giraudo
Bishop Samuel Jofré Giraudo (born ) Bishop of Villa María

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Villa María.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2013
  • c1: CB, 28 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,784

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast