Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honesto Flores Ongtioco

Bishop of Cubao, Philippines

Apostolic Administrator of Malolos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1948 Born
8 Dec 197224.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Fernando, Philippines
8 Apr 199849.4AppointedBishop of Balanga, Philippines
18 Jun 199849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Balanga, Philippines
28 Jun 200354.6AppointedBishop of Cubao, Philippines
28 Aug 200354.8InstalledBishop of Cubao, Philippines
12 May 201869.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Malolos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Honesto Flores Ongtioco
Bishop Honesto Flores Ongtioco (born ) Bishop of Cubao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Fernando, Diocese of San Fernando
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, San Fernando, Diocese of San Fernando

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cubao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,339
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 May 2018

Quantcast