Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Florentino Galang Lavarias

Archbishop of San Fernando


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1957 BornSanta Ines
26 Sep 198528.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Fernando, Philippines
19 Jun 200447.3AppointedBishop of Iba, Philippines
12 Aug 200447.4Ordained BishopBishop of Iba, Philippines
1 Sep 200447.5InstalledBishop of Iba, Philippines
25 Jul 201457.4AppointedArchbishop of San Fernando, Philippines
27 Oct 201457.6InstalledArchbishop of San Fernando, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Florentino Galang Lavarias:
Archbishop Florentino Galang Lavarias (born ) Archbishop of San Fernando

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Fernando.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,669
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2014
  • i: CB, 13 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 14 Oct 2014