Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesus Castro Galang

Deceased

Bishop of Urdaneta, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1932Born
17 Mar 196229.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Fernando, Philippines
23 May 198754.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Fernando, Philippines
23 May 198754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
4 Jul 198754.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
7 Dec 199158.9AppointedBishop of Urdaneta, Philippines
16 Sep 200471.7DiedBishop of Urdaneta, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jesus Castro Galang
Bishop Jesus Castro Galang (born , died ) Bishop of Urdaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarlac

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,509
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast