Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Virgilio Siongco David

Bishop of Kalookan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1959 BornBetis, Guagua
12 Mar 198324.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Fernando, Philippines
27 May 200647.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Fernando, Philippines
27 May 200647.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Guardialfiera
10 Jul 200647.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Guardialfiera
14 Oct 201556.6AppointedBishop of Kalookan, Philippines
2 Jan 201656.8InstalledBishop of Kalookan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Pablo Virgilio Siongco David:
Bishop Pablo Virgilio Siongco David (born ) Bishop of Kalookan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalookan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,205
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2015
  • i: CB, 15 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015