Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulo Eduardo Andrade Ponte

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1931Born
3 Apr 195422.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 197140.0AppointedBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil
21 Nov 197140.4Ordained BishopBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil
20 Mar 198452.7AppointedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
21 Sep 200574.2ResignedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
15 Mar 200977.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Eduardo Andrade Ponte
Archbishop Paulo Eduardo Andrade Ponte (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFortaleza, Archdiocese of Fortaleza, Ceara
Ordained BishopCathedral, Itapipoca, Diocese of Itapipoca, Ceara

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2005
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 880
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast