Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adauto Aurélio de Miranda Henriques

Deceased

Archbishop of Paraíba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1855Born
18 Sep 188025.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 189438.3AppointedBishop of Paraíba, Brazil
7 Jan 189438.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paraíba, Brazil
4 Mar 189438.5InstalledBishop of Paraíba, Brazil
6 Feb 191458.4AppointedArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil
15 Aug 193579.9DiedArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adauto Aurélio de Miranda Henriques (VIAF: 162193727)
Archbishop Adauto Aurélio de Miranda Henriques (born , died ) Archbishop of Paraíba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEngenho Buraco
Ordained BishopCollege Pio Latino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,894, Number 1
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 603, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,014, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast